U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00185
  • Case Name: FIRST NATIONAL BANK v. STORMY GALE M/V et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
October, 2020
  • October 31, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.