U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00186
  • Case Name: MULLEN v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2019: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protection from Trial]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.