U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00152
  • Case Name: MCLEAN v. DELHAIZE AMERICA DISTRIBUTION LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 14, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Order]
  • November 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [Order]
  • February 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order]
  • December 13, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
  • November 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.