U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20258
  • Case Name: Shanti Lyn Deschaine
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Fees Due]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Order Vacating Order Waiving Filing Fee]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.