U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00161
  • Case Name: MAINE COAST REGIONAL HEALTH FACILITIES v. CALIFORNIA NURSES ASSOCIATION
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • December 17, 2018: [Order]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.