U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20267
  • Case Name: Dale S Spaulding and Sherry A Brown-Spaulding
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.