U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00095
  • Case Name: WYMAN et al v. UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORPORATION et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2020
  • April 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 21, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
January, 2020
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Conference of Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
March, 2019
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
August, 2018
  • August 06, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Local Rule 56(h)]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 20, 2018: [Report of Conference of Counsel and Order]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.