U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20275
  • Case Name: John D Verreault
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 11, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 09, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Distribution]
March, 2019
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 13, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • August 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Withdraw Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Objection]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Expedite Hearing]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Borrow]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.