U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10261
  • Case Name: Jacqueline Roxine Martin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Rescission of Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Continue Hearing]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Continue Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf - interested parties only)]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Matrix]
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, Pasquale [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, Pasquale [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, Pasquale [Extend Time]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, Pasquale [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, Pasquale [Extend Time]
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.