U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00197
  • Case Name: YOUNG v. PROGRESSIVE INS CO
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Order]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Judgment]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Order for Service]
  • June 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 2]
  • June 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.