U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10271
  • Case Name: Brennan W. Dyer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • January 21, 2020: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • November 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
November, 2018
  • November 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Concerning Claims]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 12 Plan]
October, 2018
  • October 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 12 Confirmation]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 12 Confirmation]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.