U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00199
  • Case Name: SANBORN v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • October 15, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.