U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10272
  • Case Name: Dean Matthew Turner and Rebecca Mae McElrath
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Withdraw Document]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
December, 2018
  • December 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objection]
  • December 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Redeem]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Proposed Order]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.