U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00207
  • Case Name: WARD v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Remand to Agency]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend Procedural Order]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Judgment]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Order for Service]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.