U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20288
  • Case Name: Michelle L. Arnold
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • August 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • August 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
May, 2018
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.