U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-21004
  • Case Name: John F Lizotte and Tammi L Lizotte
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Avoid or strip Lien]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Hearing Set]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Minutes of Proceedings]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Hearing Set]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Avoid or strip Lien]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Amended Notice of Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Entry]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Avoid or Strip Lien]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Change of Address]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Amended Schedules Statements]
May, 2018
  • May 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Turner, John C. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Turner, John C. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.