U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10286
  • Case Name: Virginia W. Goodblood
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Notice of Fees Due]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Entry]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Matrix]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.