U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00150
  • Case Name: HOWARD v. DEMO SALVAGE
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 09, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Order]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.