U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20295
  • Case Name: Tia J. Cobb
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Extend Time]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.