U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:17-cv-00376
  • Case Name: KERRY v. SUN LIFE FINANCIAL (US) SERVICES INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Approval of Local Rule 56(h) Schedule]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.