U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-20443
  • Case Name: Brian J. Tremblay
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
July, 2018
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Change of Address]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Order on Severed Case]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sever Chapter 13 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.