U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20301
  • Case Name: Stephanie A. Tremblay
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Entry]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Approving Report on Conversion]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Converting Case from Chapter 13 to Chapter 7]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Assign Judge and Trustee Special Event]
  • May 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Severing Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.