U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10297
  • Case Name: David A. Winship and Lisa L. Winship
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Change of Address]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.