U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10298
  • Case Name: Jennifer Lee Basher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reply]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • March 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 02, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Conversion Schedules Filed]
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • August 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 7 to 13]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Consent]
  • July 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Convert Case 07 to 13]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Dismiss Case]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.