U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00165
  • Case Name: CHASE v. MERSON et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 02, 2019: [Order]
  • April 02, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • February 06, 2019: [Order on Bill of Costs]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order of Recusal]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
  • November 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • August 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Entry of Default]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Oral Argument/Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.