U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10306
  • Case Name: Kevin Michael Daigle
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Order to Comply]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.