U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20315
  • Case Name: Chester Knights and Peggy Knights
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Compensation]
April, 2019
  • April 07, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • April 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Compensation]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • February 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 21, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reply]
  • February 14, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Objection]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Exhibit]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
  • January 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Proposed Order]
December, 2018
  • December 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Expedite Hearing]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Expedite Hearing]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Extend Time]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
August, 2018
  • August 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.