U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10307
  • Case Name: Gregory Richard Hallee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Document]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Document]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Supplemental Document]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Supplemental Document]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.