U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10308
  • Case Name: Kimberly Lou McGary
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Change of Address]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.