U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10313
  • Case Name: Lisa J. Leavitt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
  • December 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Motion]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Relief from Stay]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
July, 2018
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Change of Address]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Chapter 07/11/13 Meeting of Creditors Continued]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Financial Management Course]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.