U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20322
  • Case Name: Matthew D. Weidemann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Vacating Order]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sua Sponte Order]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Approving Final Report & Account]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 27, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Distribution]
  • March 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing on Trustee's Chapter 7 Final Report]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amended Order]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amend]
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Hearing Set]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Amend]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Discharging Debtor - Chapter 7 Asset]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Sell]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Employ]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Financial Management Course]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
June, 2018
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1) / Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.