U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00149
  • Case Name: QUINN v. US PRISONER TRANSPORT INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 08, 2019: [Order Dismissing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Appeal from Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2018
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.