U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01003
  • Case Name: Harrington v. Getchell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • August 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • July 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
  • July 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • July 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.