U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20326
  • Case Name: Eric J. Friree
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismissing Case]
  • November 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • November 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Convert Case 7 to 13]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order on Document]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Consent]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Proposed Order]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Convert Case 07 to 13]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Response]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Proposed Order]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Response]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Dismiss Case]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Document]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 10, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.