U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01004
  • Case Name: Hull v. Getchell et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2019
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Mediation Held]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 07, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • January 07, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Mediation Set]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
  • January 02, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Stay ]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • September 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 28, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
  • August 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
  • August 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
  • August 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 14, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Document]
  • July 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
  • July 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Entry of Default]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.