U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-01005
  • Case Name: Hull v. Getchell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • February 03, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 01, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Order]
  • January 08, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Entry]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
  • January 04, 2019: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
December, 2018
  • December 05, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 03, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Set (pdf - Finding of facts)]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion]
  • September 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Certificate of Service]
  • September 07, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Generic Motion ]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • August 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Continue Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 09, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Amended Document]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.