U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20329
  • Case Name: Albert True Jordan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • September 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • September 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Amended Schedules Statements]
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Matrix]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Order to Comply]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 07)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.