U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00228
  • Case Name: CONRAD v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Judgment]
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • June 24, 2019: [SS Statement of Errors/Fact Sheet]
December, 2018
  • December 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order]
  • October 12, 2018: [Order on Order to Show Cause]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: SS Appeals]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order for Service]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.