U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10325
  • Case Name: Marshall Day Properties
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Mandate]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Final Order re: Appeal]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Default]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Appeal Transmission Form]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Stay Pending Appeal]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Vacate]
June, 2018
  • June 24, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Dismissing Case]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Extend Time]
  • June 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order on Document]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Order to Comply]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.