U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10341
  • Case Name: Charles Andrew Mathieson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • March 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 08, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 04, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • March 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • February 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Dismiss Case]
January, 2019
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • January 11, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
September, 2018
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • July 09, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • July 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
June, 2018
  • June 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Order to Comply]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Document]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Expedite Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.