U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10340
  • Case Name: Christopher Vespoli and Amanda Vespoli
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • September 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Discharging Debtor]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Perrino, P. J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.