U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00241
  • Case Name: MEYER v. DOLLAR TREE STORES INC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Pretrial Conference & Order]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.