U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20338
  • Case Name: Robert S. DuPaul, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Consent]
  • September 26, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Discharging Debtor]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Financial Management Course]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Relief from Stay]
  • September 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 09, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
  • July 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Payment Advices Transmitted]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Change of Address]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Piampiano, Jeffrey T. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.