U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10350
  • Case Name: Joy L Welch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • May 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Sua Sponte Order]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Show Cause]
  • April 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set (misc-event pdf)]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Compensation]
  • March 18, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
  • March 15, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Relief from Stay Consented]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allowing and Disallowing Claims]
  • February 12, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • February 09, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
  • February 06, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Agreed Request for Continuance]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Domestic Support Obligations]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • November 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
September, 2018
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Creditors Added]
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • July 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Schedules and Statements]
  • July 08, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 06, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Document]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order to Comply]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.