U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-02005
  • Case Name: Parris v. Pappas
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order on Document]
April, 2019
  • April 21, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Transcript]
  • April 18, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Acknowledgement of Request for Transcript of Testimony]
  • April 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • April 04, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 02, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Reply]
  • February 12, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Opposition Brief/Memorandum]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 16, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Document]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 15, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • January 14, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • January 11, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
  • January 05, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 03, 2019: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • December 28, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 26, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • December 21, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • December 07, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amended Notice of Hearing]
  • December 03, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Amended Document]
  • October 15, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
  • October 12, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 16, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 14, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Entry]
  • August 23, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Proposed Order]
  • August 22, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Hearing Set]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.