U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00182
  • Case Name: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF MAINE FOUNDATION et al v. US DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Objection to Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 23, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
August, 2018
  • August 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.