U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10360
  • Case Name: Rani Janelle Belanger
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Close Bankruptcy Case]
November, 2018
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Financial Management Course]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Generic Motion]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [9013-1(d) Deficiency Order]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Proposed Order]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Proposed Order]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Entry]
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Reopen Chapter 07 Case]
  • October 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Generic Motion]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Close Bankruptcy Case Without Discharge]
  • September 01, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Notice of Failure to file Financial Management Certification]
June, 2018
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Hull, Nathaniel R. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.