U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20346
  • Case Name: Anthony A. Russo and Sunny A. Russo
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Close Bankruptcy Case and Final Decree]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Discharging Debtor]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Entry]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement Cover Sheet]
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • October 16, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
September, 2018
  • September 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Extend Time]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Financial Management Course (eFinCert)]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Tax Returns Transmitted to Trustee]
June, 2018
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Order to Comply]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 07 No Asset]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manhart, Anthony J. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.