U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-20340
  • Case Name: Laura Bisha
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Objection]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Allow and Disallow Claims]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 01, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Proposed Order]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
January, 2019
  • January 26, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 24, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
  • January 16, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Consent]
  • January 15, 2019: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Extend Time]
December, 2018
  • December 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Deduct Wages]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • December 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Deduct Wages]
  • December 05, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing Set]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Entry]
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Schedules Statements]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
September, 2018
  • September 15, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 12, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Reminder of Ch. 13 Discharge Requirements]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Response]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #3]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment Final]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Minutes of Proceedings]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Expedite Hearing]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Hearing on Chapter 13 Confirmation]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #2]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Order Missed Installment Fee]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [File Tax Returns]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Financial Management Course]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Receipt of Installment Payment #1]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Dudley, Andrew M. [Amended Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.