U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Maine

maine Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Maine
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-00226
  • Case Name: ROUND-THE-CLOCK RESOURCES INC v. DEKRA INSIGHT INC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Notice of Settlement and Procedural Order Re: Settlement]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Confidentiality Order]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.